AL HB775 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Finance and Taxation Education
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Finance and Taxation Education
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prepaid Affordable College Tuition Trust Fund, investments required to produce equal return over 20 years, new enrollees prohibited, certain borrowing authorized, const. amend.
Title
Prepaid Affordable College Tuition Trust Fund, investments required to produce equal return over 20 years, new enrollees prohibited, certain borrowing authorized, const. amend.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Finance and Taxation Education | |
2010-04-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-04-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education | |
2010-04-13 | Engrossed | |
2010-04-13 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 988 | |
2010-04-13 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 987 | |
2010-04-13 | Bentley 2nd Amendment Offered | |
2010-04-13 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 986 | |
2010-04-13 | Bentley 1st Amendment Offered | |
2010-04-13 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-03-25 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Appropriations |