AL HB772 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Delivered to Governor at 6:30 p. m. on May 10, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Delivered to Governor at 6:30 p. m. on May 10, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
St. Clair Co., warrant recall fee for City of Moody
Title
St. Clair Co., warrant recall fee for City of Moody
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 48 Abs: 34) [FAIL]
2012-05-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 48 Abs: 34) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Delivered to Governor at 6:30 p. m. on May 10, 2012. | |
2012-05-10 | Assigned Act No. 2012-458. | |
2012-05-10 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-10 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-10 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-10 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-10 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1372 | |
2012-05-10 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-09 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-05-08 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2012-05-08 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1291 | |
2012-05-08 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-02 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-05-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |