AL HB764 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Forwarded to Governor on May 16, 2012 at 5:45 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Forwarded to Governor on May 16, 2012 at 5:45 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pike County, establish additional voting centers
Title
Pike County, establish additional voting centers
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Boothe [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 41 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 41 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Forwarded to Governor on May 16, 2012 at 5:45 p. m. on May 16, 2012. | |
2012-05-16 | Assigned Act No. 2012-540. | |
2012-05-16 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-16 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-16 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-16 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1429 | |
2012-05-16 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-10 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-05-03 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2012-05-03 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1202 | |
2012-05-03 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-02 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-05-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |