AL HB733 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Forwarded to Governor at 3:20 p.m. on April 13, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Pickens Co., drug enforcement fee in certain cases in circuit, district, and municipal courts, authorized, distrib. to district attorney drug enforcement fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pickens Co., drug enforcement fee in certain cases in circuit, district, and municipal courts, authorized, distrib. to district attorney drug enforcement fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-13 Forwarded to Governor at 3:20 p.m. on April 13, 2010.
2010-04-13 Assigned Act No. 2010-590.
2010-04-13 Clerk of the House Certification
2010-04-13 Signature Requested
2010-04-13 Enrolled
2010-04-13 Passed Second House
2010-04-13 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 955
2010-04-13 Third Reading Passed
2010-04-06 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-03-30 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
2010-03-30 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 700
2010-03-30 Third Reading Passed
2010-03-25 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-03-23 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback