AL HB732 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Delivered to Governor at 4:42 p. m. on May 8, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Delivered to Governor at 4:42 p. m. on May 8, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Randolph County, sheriff, salary and additional expense allowance
Title
Randolph County, sheriff, salary and additional expense allowance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 36 Abs: 46) [FAIL]
2012-05-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 36 Abs: 52) [FAIL]
2012-05-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 36 Abs: 46) [FAIL]
2012-05-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 36 Abs: 52) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Delivered to Governor at 4:42 p. m. on May 8, 2012. | |
2012-05-08 | Assigned Act No. 2012-367. | |
2012-05-08 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-08 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-08 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-08 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-08 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1118 | |
2012-05-08 | Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2012-05-03 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-05-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2012-05-01 | Engrossed | |
2012-05-01 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1058 | |
2012-05-01 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1057 | |
2012-05-01 | Local Legislation first Substitute Offered | |
2012-05-01 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-26 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2012-04-19 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |