AL HB72 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Assigned Act No. 2018-125 on 02/22/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Alabama Partnership Act, repealed and replaced, procedures for formation and dissolution, conforming changes, Secs. 10A-1-5.10, 10A-1-9.01 added; Secs. 10A-1-5.07, 10A-1-7.33, 10A-8-1.01 to 10A-8-11.04, inclusive, repealed; numerous sections of Title 10A, am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alabama Partnership Act, repealed and replaced, procedures for formation and dissolution, conforming changes, Secs. 10A-1-5.10, 10A-1-9.01 added; Secs. 10A-1-5.07, 10A-1-7.33, 10A-8-1.01 to 10A-8-11.04, inclusive, repealed; numerous sections of Title 10A, am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - Poole motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-125 on 02/22/2018.
2018-02-15HouseForwarded to Governor
2018-02-15HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-02-13HouseEnrolled
2018-02-13SenateSignature Requested
2018-02-13HousePassed Second House
2018-02-13SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 389
2018-02-13SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-02-01SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-18SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2018-01-18HouseEngrossed
2018-01-18HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 48
2018-01-18HousePoole motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 47
2018-01-18HousePoole Amendment Offered
2018-01-18HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-01-11HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback