AL HB715 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Perry County, Solicitors fee, civil cases in circuit and district courts, distrib. to District Attorney and Circuit Clerk
Title
Perry County, Solicitors fee, civil cases in circuit and district courts, distrib. to District Attorney and Circuit Clerk
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 46 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Further Consideration | |
2012-05-09 | Marsh Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted | |
2012-05-09 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2012-05-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2012-04-26 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 996 | |
2012-04-26 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-24 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-19 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |