AL HB714 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 2:32 p. m. on May 3, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 2:32 p. m. on May 3, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Bullock County, sheriff, authorized to participate in Employees' Retirement System, Repeal Amendment 676 (Section 4, Local Amendments, Bullock County, Recompiled Constitution of Alabama of 1901, as amended), am'd, const. amend.
Title
Bullock County, sheriff, authorized to participate in Employees' Retirement System, Repeal Amendment 676 (Section 4, Local Amendments, Bullock County, Recompiled Constitution of Alabama of 1901, as amended), am'd, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Delivered to Secretary of State at 2:32 p. m. on May 3, 2012. | |
2012-05-03 | Assigned Act No. 2012-282. | |
2012-05-03 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-03 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-03 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-03 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1021 | |
2012-05-03 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2012-04-26 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 994 | |
2012-04-26 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-24 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-19 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |