AL HB701 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Forwarded to Governor at 5:46 p. m. on May 10, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Forwarded to Governor at 5:46 p. m. on May 10, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Calhoun Co., absentee ballots, county commission authorized to manage, const. amend.
Title
Calhoun Co., absentee ballots, county commission authorized to manage, const. amend.
Sponsors
Rep. K.L. Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 31) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Forwarded to Governor at 5:46 p. m. on May 10, 2012. | |
2012-05-10 | Assigned Act No. 2012-340. | |
2012-05-10 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-10 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-10 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-10 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-10 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1368 | |
2012-05-10 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-09 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-05-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2012-05-01 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1060 | |
2012-05-01 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-26 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-17 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |