AL HB688 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Court fees increased, civil cases, criminal cases, circuit court, district court, municipal court, bail bond fees increased, distribution of proceeds to courts, sheriffs, municipalities, district attorney office, state forensic
Title
Court fees increased, civil cases, criminal cases, circuit court, district court, municipal court, bail bond fees increased, distribution of proceeds to courts, sheriffs, municipalities, district attorney office, state forensic
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-17 - House - Hill motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 75 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - House - Henry motion to Previous Question (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Sanders motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Keahey motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Bedford motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Senate - Marsh motion to Table (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 65 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-05 - House - Hill motion to Adopt (Y: 61 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-05-05 - House - Nordgren motion to Previous Question (Y: 52 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-05-05 - House - Love motion to Table (Y: 54 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-05-05 - House - Hill motion to Table (Y: 41 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2012-05-17 - House - Henry motion to Previous Question (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Sanders motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Keahey motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Bedford motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Senate - Marsh motion to Table (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 65 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-05 - House - Hill motion to Adopt (Y: 61 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-05-05 - House - Nordgren motion to Previous Question (Y: 52 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-05-05 - House - Love motion to Table (Y: 54 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-05-05 - House - Hill motion to Table (Y: 41 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p. m. on May 16, 2012. | |
2012-05-16 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-16 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-16 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2012-05-16 | Merrill intended to vote "Yea" | |
2012-05-16 | Hill motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1611 | |
2012-05-16 | Henry motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 1610 | |
2012-05-16 | Hill motion to Concur In and Adopt pending Roll Call | |
2012-05-16 | Concurrence Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1548 | |
2012-05-16 | Figures motion to Table adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-16 | Brewbaker Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-16 | Williams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1547 | |
2012-05-16 | Williams Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-16 | Williams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1546 | |
2012-05-16 | Williams Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-16 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1545 | |
2012-05-16 | Smitherman Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-16 | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1544 | |
2012-05-16 | Ward Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-16 | Figures motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1543 | |
2012-05-16 | Figures second Substitute Offered | |
2012-05-16 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-16 | Figures Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted | |
2012-05-16 | Sanders motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1453 | |
2012-05-16 | Sanders Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-16 | Keahey motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1452 | |
2012-05-16 | Keahey Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-16 | Bedford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1451 | |
2012-05-16 | Bedford Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-16 | Figures motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1450 | |
2012-05-16 | Figures first Substitute Offered | |
2012-05-16 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2012-05-10 | Marsh motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-10 | Marsh motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1292 | |
2012-05-10 | Brewbaker Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-10 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2012-05-09 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-05-08 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund | |
2012-05-03 | Engrossed | |
2012-05-03 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1265 | |
2012-05-03 | Hill substitute adopted Roll Call 1264 | |
2012-05-03 | Jones intended to vote "Yea" | |
2012-05-03 | Nordgren motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 1263 | |
2012-05-03 | Love motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1262 | |
2012-05-03 | Hill motion to Table lost Roll Call 1261 | |
2012-05-03 | Newton (C) Substitute to Hill Substitute Offered | |
2012-05-03 | Hill first Substitute Offered | |
2012-05-03 | Ways and Means General Fund Amendment #2 Offered | |
2012-05-03 | Ways and Means General Fund Amendment #1 Offered | |
2012-05-03 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-26 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments | |
2012-04-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |