AL HB687 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-02 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Local Legislation No. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-02 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Local Legislation No. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Colbert Co., pretrial diversion program, eligibility for participation, offenses further provided for, fees, Secs. 45-17-81.12, 45-17-81.17 am'd.
Title
Colbert Co., pretrial diversion program, eligibility for participation, offenses further provided for, fees, Secs. 45-17-81.12, 45-17-81.17 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 57 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2011-06-02 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-06-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2011-06-01 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1014 | |
2011-06-01 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |