AL HB683 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-02 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Local Legislation No. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-02 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Local Legislation No. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Wilcox Co., tax collector, property tax paid through Internet, convenience fee per transaction authorized
Title
Wilcox Co., tax collector, property tax paid through Internet, convenience fee per transaction authorized
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 52 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2011-06-02 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-06-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2011-06-01 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1005 | |
2011-06-01 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |