AL HB671 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 9:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 9:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Jefferson Co., alcoholic beverages, sale of wine, business relations between suppliers and wholesalers regulated, Jefferson County Wine Franchise Jobs Protection Act
Title
Jefferson Co., alcoholic beverages, sale of wine, business relations between suppliers and wholesalers regulated, Jefferson County Wine Franchise Jobs Protection Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 53 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2013-05-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 52 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 53 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2013-05-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 52 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-346. |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1145 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 992 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 2 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-05-02 | House | Engrossed |
2013-05-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1038 |
2013-05-02 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1037 |
2013-05-02 | House | Jefferson County Legislation Amendment Offered |
2013-05-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-30 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-04-24 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation |