AL HB664 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 3:25 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 3:25 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Jefferson Co., business license tax, county commission authorized to levy, exceptions and limits, distrib. to county general fund
Title
Jefferson Co., business license tax, county commission authorized to levy, exceptions and limits, distrib. to county general fund
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Canfield [R] | Sen. Merika Coleman-Evans [D] | Rep. Allen Farley [R] | Rep. Juandalynn Givan [D] |
Rep. Jack Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 29 Abs: 59) [FAIL]
2011-05-26 - House - Williams (J) motion to Suspend Rules (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 19 Abs: 67) [FAIL]
2011-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 29 Abs: 59) [FAIL]
2011-05-26 - House - Williams (J) motion to Suspend Rules (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 19 Abs: 67) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Governor at 3:25 p.m. on June 2, 2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-662 on 06/09/2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 931 | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-06-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 2 | |
2011-05-26 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 919 | |
2011-05-26 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-26 | Williams (J) motion to Suspend Rules adopted Roll Call 918 | |
2011-05-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-24 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation |