AL HB627 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 10:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 10:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Counties with population of not less than 600,000, public transit system, creation authorized, Act 87-449, 1987 Reg. Sess., Act 204, 1971 Third Sp. Sess., Act 329, 1973 Reg. Sess., Act 508, 1973 Reg. Sess., Act 993, 1971 Reg. Sess., Act 2004-500, 2004 Reg. Sess. repealed
Title
Counties with population of not less than 600,000, public transit system, creation authorized, Act 87-449, 1987 Reg. Sess., Act 204, 1971 Third Sp. Sess., Act 329, 1973 Reg. Sess., Act 508, 1973 Reg. Sess., Act 993, 1971 Reg. Sess., Act 2004-500, 2004 Reg. Sess. repealed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - House - Scott motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Smitherman table Smitherman motion to recommit (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 44 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Smitherman table Smitherman motion to recommit (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 44 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-380. |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2013-05-20 | House | Scott motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1246 |
2013-05-20 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1068 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1067 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Governmental Affairs first Substitute Offered |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Smitherman table Smitherman motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 1004 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2013-04-25 | House | Engrossed |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 831 |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 830 |
2013-04-25 | House | Jefferson County Legislation Amendment Offered |
2013-04-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation |
2013-04-16 | House | Read for the first time |