AL HB625 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Albertville, Municipal Utilities Board, local act creating repealed, Act 1943-287, 1943 Reg. Sess., repealed
Title
Albertville, Municipal Utilities Board, local act creating repealed, Act 1943-287, 1943 Reg. Sess., repealed
Sponsors
Rep. Kerry Rich [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Whatley to table Smitherman motion to rerefer (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 60 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Whatley to table Smitherman motion to rerefer (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 60 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-428. |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1192 |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Whatley to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 570 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Smitherman motion to rerefer |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2013-04-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 669 |
2013-04-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |