AL HB619 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Forwarded to Governor on May 3, 2012 at 2:455 p. m. on May 3, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Forwarded to Governor on May 3, 2012 at 2:455 p. m. on May 3, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Perdido Beach, corp. limits alt.
Title
Perdido Beach, corp. limits alt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 39 Abs: 41) [FAIL]
2012-04-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 39 Abs: 41) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Forwarded to Governor on May 3, 2012 at 2:455 p. m. on May 3, 2012. | |
2012-05-03 | Assigned Act No. 2012-336 on 05/10/2012. | |
2012-05-03 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-03 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-03 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-03 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1015 | |
2012-05-03 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-24 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2012-04-19 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 894 | |
2012-04-19 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-17 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-03 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation |