AL HB610 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Delivered to Governor at 1:20 p.m. on April 14, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Delivered to Governor at 1:20 p.m. on April 14, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Winston Co., judge of probate, motor vehicle, boat, and business licenses, issuance by mail or electronic means, fee, referendum
Title
Winston Co., judge of probate, motor vehicle, boat, and business licenses, issuance by mail or electronic means, fee, referendum
Sponsors
Rep. John Letson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Delivered to Governor at 1:20 p.m. on April 14, 2010. | |
2010-04-14 | Assigned Act No. 2010-518. | |
2010-04-14 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-04-14 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-13 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-13 | Passed Second House | |
2010-04-13 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1009 | |
2010-04-13 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-11 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2010-04-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-03-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 450 | |
2010-03-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-23 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |