AL HB604 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 2:15 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 2:15 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Macon Co., business licenses, county commission authorized to set fees
Title
Macon Co., business licenses, county commission authorized to set fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 37 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 37 Abs: 30) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Governor at 2:15 p.m. on June 2, 2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-598. | |
2011-06-02 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 903 | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2011-05-24 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 782 | |
2011-05-24 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-04 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |