AL HB593 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 3:25 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 3:25 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Russell Co., alcoholic beverages, county commission may authorize sale of draft or keg beer in unincorporated area of the county, Sunday sales authorized
Title
Russell Co., alcoholic beverages, county commission may authorize sale of draft or keg beer in unincorporated area of the county, Sunday sales authorized
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 33 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 33 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Governor at 3:25 p.m. on June 2, 2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-659 on 06/09/2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 928 | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-06-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2011-05-24 | Davis intended to vote "Nay" | |
2011-05-24 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 775 | |
2011-05-24 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-03 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |