AL HB588 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 22 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - Forwarded to Governor on April 22, 2010 at 5:45 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Preneed funeral and cemetery services, sellers of required to be licensed by Board of Funeral Service or obtain certificate of authority from Insurance Department, certificate of authority requirements altered, trust requirements specified, bonds, penalties increased, Funeral and Cemetery Preneed Consumer Protection Fund established, cemetery authorities further provided for, Secs. 27-17A-5, 27-17A-26 added; Secs. 27-17A-3, 27-17A-10, 27-17A-11, 27-17A-12, 27-17A-13, 27-17A-14, 27-17A-15, 27-17A-22, 27-17A-25, 27-17A-30, 27-17A-31, 27-17A-32, 27-17A-40, 27-17A-41, 27-17A-42, 27-17A-43, 27-17A-44, 27-17A-50, 27-17A-55 am'd. (2010-20437)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preneed funeral and cemetery services, sellers of required to be licensed by Board of Funeral Service or obtain certificate of authority from Insurance Department, certificate of authority requirements altered, trust requirements specified, bonds, penalties increased, Funeral and Cemetery Preneed Consumer Protection Fund established, cemetery authorities further provided for, Secs. 27-17A-5, 27-17A-26 added; Secs. 27-17A-3, 27-17A-10, 27-17A-11, 27-17A-12, 27-17A-13, 27-17A-14, 27-17A-15, 27-17A-22, 27-17A-25, 27-17A-30, 27-17A-31, 27-17A-32, 27-17A-40, 27-17A-41, 27-17A-42, 27-17A-43, 27-17A-44, 27-17A-50, 27-17A-55 am'd. (2010-20437)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-22 Forwarded to Governor on April 22, 2010 at 5:45 p.m.
2010-04-22 Clerk of the House Certification
2010-04-22 Enrolled
2010-04-22 Johnson motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1153
2010-04-22 Concurrence Requested
2010-04-22 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1234
2010-04-22 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1233
2010-04-22 Glover Amendment Offered
2010-04-22 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1232
2010-04-22 Smitherman Amendment Offered
2010-04-22 Third Reading Passed
2010-04-21 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-04-14 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance
2010-04-13 Engrossed
2010-04-13 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 977
2010-04-13 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 976
2010-04-13 Martin Amendment Offered
2010-04-13 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 975
2010-04-13 Government Operations Substitute Offered
2010-04-13 Third Reading Passed
2010-04-01 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2010-02-17 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Government Operations

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback