AL HB575 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 2:15 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 2:15 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Madison Co., sheriff, pistol permits, fee increased, Act 489, 1975 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Title
Madison Co., sheriff, pistol permits, fee increased, Act 489, 1975 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Ball [R] | Rep. Laura Hall [D] | Rep. Wayne Johnson [R] | Rep. Mac McCutcheon [R] |
Rep. Jim Patterson [R] | Rep. Howard Sanderford [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 39 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 39 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Governor at 2:15 p.m. on June 2, 2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-591. | |
2011-06-02 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 919 | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 4 | |
2011-05-26 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 895 | |
2011-05-26 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Madison County Legislation |