AL HB573 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on May 4, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on May 4, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State parks and histroical sites, bonding authority of the Alabama State Parks Enhancement Authority, improvement and maintenance of state parks historical sites under Ala. Historical Commission, Sec. 40-23-35 am'd.
Title
State parks and histroical sites, bonding authority of the Alabama State Parks Enhancement Authority, improvement and maintenance of state parks historical sites under Ala. Historical Commission, Sec. 40-23-35 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1273 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - SBIR: Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 1272 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 783 (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 782 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 781 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 780 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Ledbetter motion to Table Roll Call 779 (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Ledbetter motion to Table Roll Call 778 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - HBIR: Ledbetter motion to Adopt Roll Call 777 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - SBIR: Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 1272 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 783 (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 782 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 781 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 780 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Ledbetter motion to Table Roll Call 779 (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Ledbetter motion to Table Roll Call 778 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - HBIR: Ledbetter motion to Adopt Roll Call 777 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on May 4, 2021. |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-409. |
2021-05-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-04-29 | House | Enrolled |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1273 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Singleton motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2021-04-13 | House | Engrossed |
2021-04-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 783 |
2021-04-13 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 782 |
2021-04-13 | House | Bracy Amendment Offered |
2021-04-13 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 781 |
2021-04-13 | House | Clouse 2nd Amendment Offered |
2021-04-13 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 780 |
2021-04-13 | House | Clouse 1st Amendment Offered |
2021-04-13 | House | Ledbetter motion to Table adopted Roll Call 779 |
2021-04-13 | House | Ways and Means General Fund 2nd Amendment Offered |
2021-04-13 | House | Ledbetter motion to Table adopted Roll Call 778 |
2021-04-13 | House | Ways and Means General Fund 1st Amendment Offered |
2021-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-07 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2021-03-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |