AL HB567 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Delivered to Governor at 3:55 p.m. on May 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Delivered to Governor at 3:55 p.m. on May 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hamilton, alcoholic beverages, draft or keg beer, sale authorized by ordinance of city council
Title
Hamilton, alcoholic beverages, draft or keg beer, sale authorized by ordinance of city council
Sponsors
Rep. Tracy Estes [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 84 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 84 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:55 p.m. on May 29, 2019. |
2019-05-29 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-390. |
2019-05-29 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-29 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1272 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2019-05-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 590 |
2019-05-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |