AL HB566 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Forwarded to Governor at 10:40 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Forwarded to Governor at 10:40 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prescription drugs, to provide a named federal health care center to fill certain prescriptions, Sec. 34-23-70 am'd
Title
Prescription drugs, to provide a named federal health care center to fill certain prescriptions, Sec. 34-23-70 am'd
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Forwarded to Governor at 10:40 p. m. on May 16, 2012. | |
2012-05-16 | Assigned Act No. 2012-553. | |
2012-05-16 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-16 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-16 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-16 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1498 | |
2012-05-16 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-09 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-05-03 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education | |
2012-05-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1135 | |
2012-05-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-19 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-20 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |