AL HB566 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 4:25 p.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Tuscaloosa, motor vehicles, automated traffic infraction device, use for red light enforcement authorized, procedures, posting of informational signs, civil fines, record keeping by Criminal Justice Information Center, appeals, tampering with photographic traffic signal enforcement system, prohibited, Tuscaloosa Red Light Safety Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tuscaloosa, motor vehicles, automated traffic infraction device, use for red light enforcement authorized, procedures, posting of informational signs, civil fines, record keeping by Criminal Justice Information Center, appeals, tampering with photographic traffic signal enforcement system, prohibited, Tuscaloosa Red Light Safety Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-22 Delivered to Governor at 4:25 p.m. on April 22, 2010.
2010-04-22 Assigned Act No. 2010-711.
2010-04-22 Clerk of the House Certification
2010-04-22 Signature Requested
2010-04-22 Enrolled
2010-04-22 Second House Concurs in Executive Amendment
2010-04-22 Singleton motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1228
2010-04-22 House of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment
2010-04-22 England motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1132
2010-04-22 Executive Amendment Offered
2010-04-22 Forwarded to Governor
2010-04-08 Clerk of the House Certification
2010-04-08 Signature Requested
2010-04-06 Enrolled
2010-04-06 Passed Second House
2010-04-06 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 696
2010-04-06 Third Reading Passed
2010-03-09 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
2010-03-25 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-03-02 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 446
2010-03-02 Third Reading Passed
2010-02-25 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-02-16 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Tuscaloosa County Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback