AL HB553 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Forwarded to Executive Department
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Forwarded to Executive Department
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Colbert Co., co. commission authorize to provide compensation of the chair and members
Title
Colbert Co., co. commission authorize to provide compensation of the chair and members
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 65 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 65 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | Forwarded to Executive Department |
2016-05-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2016-380. |
2016-05-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-05-04 | House | Enrolled |
2016-05-04 | House | Passed Second House |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1031 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2016-04-21 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 706 |
2016-04-21 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-04-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |