AL HB553 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Wilcox Co., sheriff authorized to sell certain abandoned, unclaimed, or stolen property, and firearms, notice, record keeping requirement, distribution of funds for law enforcement purposes
Title
Wilcox Co., sheriff authorized to sell certain abandoned, unclaimed, or stolen property, and firearms, notice, record keeping requirement, distribution of funds for law enforcement purposes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Dial table Dial motion to recommit (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Dial table Dial motion to recommit (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2013-387. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1156 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Dial table Dial motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 942 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2013-04-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 477 |
2013-04-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-10 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |