AL HB553 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Delivered to Governor at 11:38 a.m. on March 25, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Delivered to Governor at 11:38 a.m. on March 25, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Franklin Co., proposed constitutional amendment to authorize additional court costs in domestic violence cases, repealed, Act 2009-305, 2009 Reg. Sess. repealed
Title
Franklin Co., proposed constitutional amendment to authorize additional court costs in domestic violence cases, repealed, Act 2009-305, 2009 Reg. Sess. repealed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Delivered to Governor at 11:38 a.m. on March 25, 2010. | |
2010-03-25 | Assigned Act No. 2010-229. | |
2010-03-25 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-03-25 | Signature Requested | |
2010-03-25 | Enrolled | |
2010-03-25 | Passed Second House | |
2010-03-23 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 557 | |
2010-03-23 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-09 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-25 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2010-02-17 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 288 | |
2010-02-17 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-16 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-11 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |