AL HB54 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Line of duty death benefit, expand to volunteer firefighters who die of cancer
Title
Line of duty death benefit, expand to volunteer firefighters who die of cancer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2024-02-22 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 88 |
2024-02-22 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-21 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-06 | House | Pending House Ways and Means General Fund |
2024-02-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2024-01-12 | House | Prefiled |