AL HB538 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Delivered to Governor at 10:11 a.m. on April 29, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Absentee ballots, timeframe for applying to vote absentee, revised, to revise certain procedures for processing absentee ballots, Secs. 17-11-3, 17-11-10, 17-11-18 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Absentee ballots, timeframe for applying to vote absentee, revised, to revise certain procedures for processing absentee ballots, Secs. 17-11-3, 17-11-10, 17-11-18 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-27 - House - Baker motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 999 (Y: 81 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1134 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 1133 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - SBIR: Gudger motion to Adopt Roll Call 1132 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 565 (Y: 79 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 564 (Y: 78 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - HBIR: Baker motion to Adopt Roll Call 563 (Y: 83 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:11 a.m. on April 29, 2021.
2021-04-29HouseAssigned Act No. 2021-364.
2021-04-29HouseClerk of the House Certification
2021-04-29SenateSignature Requested
2021-04-27HouseEnrolled
2021-04-27SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2021-04-27HouseBaker motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 999
2021-04-27HouseConcurrence Requested
2021-04-22SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1134
2021-04-22SenateSingleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1133
2021-04-22SenateSingleton Amendment Offered
2021-04-22SenateThird Reading Passed
2021-04-01SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
2021-03-30HouseEngrossed
2021-03-30HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 565
2021-03-30HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 564
2021-03-30HouseConstitution, Campaigns and Elections Amendment Offered
2021-03-30HouseThird Reading Passed
2021-03-18HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2021-03-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
171110Amended CodeSee Bill Text
171118Amended CodeSee Bill Text
17113Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB538&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/HB538-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/HB538-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/HB538-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/212043-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/213643-1.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42391.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42419.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42601.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=653934&VOTE=563&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20HB538&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=653938&VOTE=564&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=653939&VOTE=565&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=660506&VOTE=1132&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20HB538&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=660510&VOTE=1133&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=660511&VOTE=1134&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=661304&VOTE=999&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback