AL HB536 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grandparent visitation, family law, grandparents entitled to visitation of grandchild if parents die or divorce, presumption is that visitation with grandparent is in best interest of child, Sec. 30-3-4.2 am'd.
Title
Grandparent visitation, family law, grandparents entitled to visitation of grandchild if parents die or divorce, presumption is that visitation with grandparent is in best interest of child, Sec. 30-3-4.2 am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Indefinitely Postponed |
2021-04-01 | House | Judiciary first Amendment Offered |
2021-04-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-03-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB276 (Same As) 2021-04-20 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary