AL HB53 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-07 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Class 5 municipalities, tax sale properties acquired from State Land Commissioner, expedited procedure to quiet title in lieu of procedures in Title 40, Chapter 10, Code of Alabama 1975

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Class 5 municipalities, tax sale properties acquired from State Land Commissioner, expedited procedure to quiet title in lieu of procedures in Title 40, Chapter 10, Code of Alabama 1975

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-07 - House - Boyd motion to Table (Y: 35 N: 39 NV: 8 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2015-08-07 - House - Boyd motion to Table (Y: 27 N: 38 NV: 7 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
2015-08-07 - House - Greer motion to Carry Over Until Specified Time (Y: 39 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 27) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-07HouseFurther Consideration
2015-08-07HouseBoyd motion to Table lost Roll Call 39
2015-08-07HouseGreer motion to Carry Over Until Specified Time carried over to time certain
2015-08-11HouseBoyd motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2015-08-07HouseHarbison motion to withdrew his amendment adopted Voice Vote
2015-08-11HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2015-08-07HouseBoyd motion to Table lost Roll Call 38
2015-08-07HouseHarbison Amendment Offered
2015-08-07HouseGreer motion to Carry Over Until Specified Time adopted Roll Call 40
2015-08-07HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2015-08-06HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-05HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback