AL HB526 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Local Legislation No. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Local Legislation No. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Elmore Co., Millbrook and Wetumpka, alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales and draft beer authorized
Title
Elmore Co., Millbrook and Wetumpka, alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales and draft beer authorized
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 57 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 50 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - House - Beckman motion to recommit (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 25 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 50 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - House - Beckman motion to recommit (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 25 Abs: 30) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Local Legislation No. 1 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2014-03-20 | House | Engrossed |
2014-03-20 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 899 |
2014-03-20 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 898 |
2014-03-20 | House | Local Legislation first Substitute Offered |
2014-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-19 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2014-03-11 | House | Beckman motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 652 |
2014-03-11 | House | Recommitted from Calendar to Local Legislation |
2014-02-27 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |