AL HB524 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 9:46 a.m. on April 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 9:46 a.m. on April 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cherokee Ridge, corp. limits alt.
Title
Cherokee Ridge, corp. limits alt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1007 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - HBIR: Kitchens motion to Adopt Roll Call 803 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 804 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 74 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - House - HBIR: Kitchens motion to Adopt Roll Call 803 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 45 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - HBIR: Kitchens motion to Adopt Roll Call 803 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 804 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 74 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - House - HBIR: Kitchens motion to Adopt Roll Call 803 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 45 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:46 a.m. on April 7, 2022. |
2022-04-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-385. |
2022-04-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-04-06 | House | Enrolled |
2022-04-06 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1007 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2022-03-31 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 804 |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-30 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-29 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
Same As/Similar To
SB332 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Kitchens motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote