AL HB516 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Forwarded to Governor on May 17, 2017 at 5:13 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Fultondale,municipal judges and magistrates for municipal courts, authorized to issue warrant recall fee for failure to appear for municipal ordinance or traffic violation, distrib. to municipal corrections fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fultondale,municipal judges and magistrates for municipal courts, authorized to issue warrant recall fee for failure to appear for municipal ordinance or traffic violation, distrib. to municipal corrections fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 72 Abs: 16) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-17HouseForwarded to Governor on May 17, 2017 at 5:13 p.m.
2017-05-17HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-424.
2017-05-17HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-05-17HouseEnrolled
2017-05-17SenateSignature Requested
2017-05-17HousePassed Second House
2017-05-17SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1134
2017-05-17SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-05-11SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-05-04SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Jefferson County
2017-05-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 775
2017-05-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-05-03HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-04-18HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback