AL HB515 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 3:25 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 3:25 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Birmingham, firemen and police officers, pension system, supplemental, investments, Act 556, 1959 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Title
Birmingham, firemen and police officers, pension system, supplemental, investments, Act 556, 1959 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 42 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
2011-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 42 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Governor at 3:25 p.m. on June 2, 2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-584. | |
2011-06-02 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 929 | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-06-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 2 | |
2011-05-26 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 887 | |
2011-05-26 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation |