AL HB510 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Forwarded to Governor on April 13, 2021 at 2:53 p.m. on April 13, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, amended to revise, effective July 1, 2021, certain contribution rates, eligibility requirements, maximum normal retirement benefit, ordinary disability allowance, spousal survivor benefits, and early retirement benefits, Secs. 45-37A-51.190, 45-37A-51.192, 45-37A-51.196, 45-37A-51.220, 45-37A-51.221, 45-37A-51.222, 45-37A-51.225, 45-37A-51.228, 45-37A-51.232, 45-37A-51.244, 45-37A-51.302, 45-37A-51.305, 45-37A-51.306, 45-37A-51.307, 45-37A-51.308 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, amended to revise, effective July 1, 2021, certain contribution rates, eligibility requirements, maximum normal retirement benefit, ordinary disability allowance, spousal survivor benefits, and early retirement benefits, Secs. 45-37A-51.190, 45-37A-51.192, 45-37A-51.196, 45-37A-51.220, 45-37A-51.221, 45-37A-51.222, 45-37A-51.225, 45-37A-51.228, 45-37A-51.232, 45-37A-51.244, 45-37A-51.302, 45-37A-51.305, 45-37A-51.306, 45-37A-51.307, 45-37A-51.308 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 909 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - SBIR: Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt Roll Call 908 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 651 (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 57 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - House - Wheeler motion to Previous Question Roll Call 650 (Y: 58 N: 23 NV: 6 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - HBIR: Treadaway motion to Adopt Roll Call 649 (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 25 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseForwarded to Governor on April 13, 2021 at 2:53 p.m. on April 13, 2021.
2021-04-13HouseAssigned Act No. 2021-245.
2021-04-13HouseClerk of the House Certification
2021-04-13HouseEnrolled
2021-04-13SenateSignature Requested
2021-04-13HousePassed Second House
2021-04-13SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 909
2021-04-13SenateThird Reading Passed
2021-04-08SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-04-06SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Jefferson County Legislation
2021-04-06HouseMoore (M) intended to vote "Nay"
2021-04-06HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 651
2021-04-06HouseWheeler motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 650
2021-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed
2021-03-18HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-03-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation

Same As/Similar To

SB372 (Same As) 2021-04-08 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4537A51.190Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4537A51.192Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4537A51.196Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4537A51.220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4537A51.221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4537A51.222Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4537A51.225Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4537A51.228Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4537A51.232Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4537A51.244Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4537A51.302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4537A51.305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4537A51.306Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4537A51.307Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4537A51.308Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB510&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/HB510-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/HB510-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=655226&VOTE=649&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20HB510&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=655332&VOTE=650&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=655346&VOTE=651&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=657182&VOTE=908&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20HB510&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=657184&VOTE=909&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments 750

feedback