AL HB510 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Delivered to Governor at 1:36 p.m. on May 28, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Delivered to Governor at 1:36 p.m. on May 28, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tuscaloosa Co., retirement system for police officers and firefighters, pension benefits, member contribution, Act 99-568, 1999 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Title
Tuscaloosa Co., retirement system for police officers and firefighters, pension benefits, member contribution, Act 99-568, 1999 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 46 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 46 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:36 p.m. on May 28, 2015. |
2015-05-28 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-331. |
2015-05-28 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-05-28 | House | Enrolled |
2015-05-28 | House | Passed Second House |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1244 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2015-04-28 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 515 |
2015-04-28 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Tuscaloosa County Legislation |