AL HB510 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor on June 2, 2011 at 8:30 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor on June 2, 2011 at 8:30 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Good Samaritan Law, civil immunity granted to certain persons, in good faith, without compensation, for participation in emergency response activities, Sec. 6-5-332 am'd.
Title
Good Samaritan Law, civil immunity granted to certain persons, in good faith, without compensation, for participation in emergency response activities, Sec. 6-5-332 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Ball [R] | Rep. Richard Baughn [R] | Rep. Greg Burdine [D] | Rep. Terri Collins [R] |
Rep. Juandalynn Givan [D] | Rep. Micky Hammon [R] | Rep. Ed Henry [R] | Rep. Ken Johnson [R] |
Rep. Mike Jones [R] | Rep. Wes Long [R] | Rep. Becky Nordgren [R] | Rep. Jeremy Oden [R] |
Rep. Jim Patterson [R] | Rep. Dan Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - House - Collins motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 40) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 40) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Governor on June 2, 2011 at 8:30 p.m. | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-579. | |
2011-06-02 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2011-06-02 | Collins motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1125 | |
2011-06-02 | Concurrence Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1008 | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1007 | |
2011-06-02 | Judiciary Amendment Offered | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2011-05-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2011-05-24 | Cosponsors Added | |
2011-05-24 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 850 | |
2011-05-24 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |