AL HB51 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-11 - Delivered to Governor at 1:50 p.m. on August 11, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Morgan Co., court costs, add'l distrib. to circuit clerk and district attorney

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Morgan Co., court costs, add'l distrib. to circuit clerk and district attorney

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-08-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 60 Abs: 23) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-11HouseDelivered to Governor at 1:50 p.m. on August 11, 2015.
2015-08-11Senate
2015-08-11HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-520.
2015-08-11HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-08-11SenateSignature Requested
2015-08-11HouseEnrolled
2015-08-11HousePassed Second House
2015-08-11SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 70
2015-08-11SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-08-10SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-07SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2015-08-07HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 35
2015-08-07HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-08-06HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-04HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback