AL HB462 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Jefferson County
Pending: Senate Local Legislation, Jefferson County Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Birmingham, city council and mayor, term of office, Secs. 45-37A-52.50, 45-37A-52.90 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Birmingham, city council and mayor, term of office, Secs. 45-37A-52.50, 45-37A-52.90 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 73 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Jefferson County
2018-03-20HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 886
2018-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-03-15HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-27HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback