AL HB453 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Finance and Taxation Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Finance and Taxation Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, distinctive tags, veterans, motorcycle available at same cost as car tag of same designation
Title
Motor vehicles, distinctive tags, veterans, motorcycle available at same cost as car tag of same designation
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Baker [R] | Rep. Napoleon Bracy [D] | Rep. K.L. Brown [R] | Rep. Joe Faust [R] |
Rep. Thomas Jackson [D] | Rep. Barry Mask [R] | Rep. Darrio Melton [D] | Rep. Elwyn Thomas [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-19 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Finance and Taxation Education | |
2012-05-09 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-05-08 | Re-referred to Committee on Finance and Taxation Education | |
2012-04-17 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs | |
2012-04-17 | Cosponsors Added | |
2012-04-17 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 854 | |
2012-04-17 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |