AL HB451 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Forwarded to Governor on March 27, 2018 at 6:09 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Birmingham, alcoholic beverage, Sunday sales, city council authorized to commence at 10:00 a.m.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Birmingham, alcoholic beverage, Sunday sales, city council authorized to commence at 10:00 a.m.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 71 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27HouseForwarded to Governor on March 27, 2018 at 6:09 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
2018-03-27HouseForwarded to Governor on March 27, 2018 at 6:09 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
2018-03-27HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-514.
2018-03-27HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-27HouseEnrolled
2018-03-27SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-27HousePassed Second House
2018-03-27SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1171
2018-03-27SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-22SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-03-21SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Jefferson County
2018-03-20HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 888
2018-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-03-15HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-22HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback