AL HB444 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Elmore Co., board of education, school buildings and property, insurance with the State Insurance Fund or with an insurance company, authorized
Title
Elmore Co., board of education, school buildings and property, insurance with the State Insurance Fund or with an insurance company, authorized
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 296 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 70 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - House - HBIR: Holmes motion to Adopt Roll Call 295 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 47 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - HBIR: Holmes motion to Adopt Roll Call 295 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 47 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2021-03-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 296 |
2021-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-04 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-24 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
Same As/Similar To
SB271 (Same As) 2021-03-16 - Assigned Act No. 2021-149.