AL HB434 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Delivered to Governor at 7:00 p.m. on June 1, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Delivered to Governor at 7:00 p.m. on June 1, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation, Multistate Tax Compact, determination of state and local tax liability of multistate business taxpayers, business income, apportionment, sales, other than tangible personal property, apportionment based taxpayers market for sale, Sec. 40-27-1 am'd.
Title
Taxation, Multistate Tax Compact, determination of state and local tax liability of multistate business taxpayers, business income, apportionment, sales, other than tangible personal property, apportionment based taxpayers market for sale, Sec. 40-27-1 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Love [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Delivered to Governor at 7:00 p.m. on June 1, 2011. | |
2011-06-01 | Assigned Act No. 2011-616. | |
2011-06-01 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-06-01 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-01 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-01 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-01 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 872 | |
2011-06-01 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-05 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education | |
2011-05-04 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 650 | |
2011-05-04 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-05 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |