AL HB43 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-11 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Use tax, revenue redistributed, portions earmarked for various agencies, Secs. 40-23-61, 40-23-85, 40-23-174 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Use tax, revenue redistributed, portions earmarked for various agencies, Secs. 40-23-61, 40-23-85, 40-23-174 am'd.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-11HouseFurther Consideration
2015-08-11HouseClouse motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2015-08-11HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2015-08-10HousePoole motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2015-08-10HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2015-08-07HouseGaston motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2015-08-07HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2015-08-06HousePoole motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2015-08-06HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2015-08-05HousePoole motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2015-08-05HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2015-08-05HouseDavis motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2015-08-05HouseWays and Means Education first Substitute Offered
2015-08-05HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2015-08-04HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2015-08-03HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback