AL HB423 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to Talladega County; to amend Section 11 of Act 91-533 of the 1991 Regular Session (Acts 1991, p. 948), as last amended by Act 2019-156 of the 2019 Regular Session, to further provide for the distribution of a special county sales and use tax; and to repeal Act 2015-515 of the 2015 Regular Session, relating to the distribution of a portion of the special sales and use tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to Talladega County; to amend Section 11 of Act 91-533 of the 1991 Regular Session (Acts 1991, p. 948), as last amended by Act 2019-156 of the 2019 Regular Session, to further provide for the distribution of a special county sales and use tax; and to repeal Act 2015-515 of the 2015 Regular Session, relating to the distribution of a portion of the special sales and use tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-23 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 81 Abs: 12) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-23HouseEnacted
2023-05-23HouseEnrolled
2023-05-23SenateReady to Enroll
2023-05-23SenateRead a Third Time and Pass
2023-05-23SenateOn Third Reading in Second House
2023-05-18SenateRead Second Time in Second House
2023-05-18SenateReported Out of Committee in Second House
2023-05-17SenateReported Favorably from Senate Local Legislation
2023-05-16SenateReferred to Committee to Senate Local Legislation
2023-05-16HouseRead First Time in Second House
2023-05-16HouseRead a Third Time and Pass
2023-05-16HouseOn Third Reading in House of Origin
2023-05-11HouseRead Second Time in House of Origin
2023-05-11HouseReported Out of Committee in House of Origin
2023-05-11HouseReported Favorably from House Local Legislation
2023-05-02HouseIntroduced and Referred to House Local Legislation
2023-05-02HouseRead First Time in House of Origin

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback