AL HB421 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Forwarded to Governor on March 22, 2018 at 2:22 p.m. on March 22, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Forwarded to Governor on March 22, 2018 at 2:22 p.m. on March 22, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Evictions, reducing notice period for lease termination, expanding list of non-curable defaults, Sec. 35-9A-421 am'd.
Title
Evictions, reducing notice period for lease termination, expanding list of non-curable defaults, Sec. 35-9A-421 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 78 N: 4 NV: 12 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 81 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 78 N: 4 NV: 12 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 81 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Forwarded to Governor on March 22, 2018 at 2:22 p.m. on March 22, 2018. |
2018-03-22 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-473. |
2018-03-22 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-03-22 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-22 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1050 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-08 | House | Clarke intended to vote "Nay" |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2018-03-08 | House | Engrossed |
2018-03-08 | House | Hanes intended to vote "Yea" |
2018-03-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 647 |
2018-03-08 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 646 |
2018-03-08 | House | Coleman Amendment Offered |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |