AL HB421 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 10:19 p.m. on May 17, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 10:19 p.m. on May 17, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Toll roads and bridges, electronic assessment and collection of tolls, assessment to account holder or by photo-monitoring, administrative fees for nonpayment, judgements, suspension of driver's licenses and registration, Secs 23-2-165 to 23-2-175, inclusive, added; Sec. 23-2-163 repealed
Title
Toll roads and bridges, electronic assessment and collection of tolls, assessment to account holder or by photo-monitoring, administrative fees for nonpayment, judgements, suspension of driver's licenses and registration, Secs 23-2-165 to 23-2-175, inclusive, added; Sec. 23-2-163 repealed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 78 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Bracy motion to Table (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 78 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Bracy motion to Table (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:19 p.m. on May 17, 2017. |
2017-05-17 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-375. |
2017-05-17 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-05-17 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-17 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1236 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy |
2017-05-02 | House | Engrossed |
2017-05-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 696 |
2017-05-02 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 695 |
2017-05-02 | House | McMillan first Substitute Offered |
2017-05-02 | House | Bracy motion to Table adopted Roll Call 694 |
2017-05-02 | House | Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure Amendment Offered |
2017-05-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-03-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |